NH HB205 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Signed by the Governor on 6/8/2015; Chapter 121; Effective Date 6/8/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Signed by the Governor on 6/8/2015; Chapter 121; Effective Date 6/8/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to lending practices of energy efficiency and clean energy districts.
Title
Relative to lending practices of energy efficiency and clean energy districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-11 | House | Signed by the Governor on 6/8/2015; Chapter 121; Effective Date 6/8/2015 |
2015-05-13 | House | Enrolled (in recess of 5/6/2015); House Journal 41, PG. 1779 |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 5/7/2015); Senate Journal 14 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 12 |
2015-04-17 | Senate | === RESCHEDULED === Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/30/15; Senate Calendar 19 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | === CANCELLED SESSION === Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/23/15; Senate Calendar 18 |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Hearing: 4/8/15, Room 100, State House, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 16 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-12 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0675h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG. 1254-1256 |
2015-03-12 | House | Amendment #0675h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG. 1254-1256 |
2015-03-03 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2015-03-03 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0675h for Mar 11 (Vote 14-3; Regular Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 434 |
2015-02-18 | House | Recommit (Rep J. Belanger): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG. 520-521 |
2015-02-13 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 18 (Vote 12-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar13, PG. 248 |
2015-02-05 | House | Executive Session: 2/10/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 2/5/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 12, PG. 212 |