NH HB205 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Failed on February 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.301-302
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Failed on February 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.301-302
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the identification of dental prosthetic and orthodontic appliances.
Title
Relative to the identification of dental prosthetic and orthodontic appliances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.301-302 |
2013-01-30 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 6 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 11, PG.150 |
2013-01-23 | House | Executive Session: 1/30/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-01-23 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 1/29/2013 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-01-16 | House | Public Hearing: 1/22/2013 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs; House Journal 12, PG.186 |