NH HB204 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 30 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-30 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 30 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-30 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to bonds for public employees.
Title
Relative to bonds for public employees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | House | Died on Table |
2017-03-09 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. McGuire): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 64 |
2017-03-08 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Marple) 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 7 |
2017-03-01 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/08/2017 (Vote 18-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 12 |
2017-02-15 | House | Executive Session: 02/23/2017 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2017-01-31 | House | Public Hearing: 02/07/2017 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2016-12-30 | House | Introduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 2 P. 20 |