NH HB202 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on December 30 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-02 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/02/2017 House Journal 5 P. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 30 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-02 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/02/2017 House Journal 5 P. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring notice to municipalities of the relocation of state offices located within the municipality.
Title
Requiring notice to municipalities of the relocation of state offices located within the municipality.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-02 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/02/2017 House Journal 5 P. 5 |
2017-01-25 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/02/2017 (Vote 16-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 4 |
2017-01-17 | House | Executive Session: 01/25/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2016-12-30 | House | Introduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 2 P. 20 |