NH HB2018 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/02/2018; Chapter 358; Eff. 07/02/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/02/2018; Chapter 358; Eff. 07/02/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the state 10-year transportation improvement program, establishing a committee to study the removal of the Merrimack tolls, and establishing a committee to study driveway permitting.
Title
Relative to the state 10-year transportation improvement program, establishing a committee to study the removal of the Merrimack tolls, and establishing a committee to study driveway permitting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-23 - Senate - Conference Committee Report 2049c (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment Remainder of the Bill and Effective Date (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment Remainder of the Bill and Effective Date (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment Sections 3 and 27 (Y: 12 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Sen. Giuda Floor Amendment 1932s Section 9, Lines 1-12 (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Committee Amendment 1807s Section 3, Lines 1-7 (Y: 12 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-15 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 166 N: 160 NV: 23 Abs: 43) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment Remainder of the Bill and Effective Date (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment Remainder of the Bill and Effective Date (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment Sections 3 and 27 (Y: 12 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Sen. Giuda Floor Amendment 1932s Section 9, Lines 1-12 (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Committee Amendment 1807s Section 3, Lines 1-7 (Y: 12 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-15 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 166 N: 160 NV: 23 Abs: 43) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-10 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/02/2018; Chapter 358; Eff. 07/02/2018 |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-06-11 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2116e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-06-06 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2116e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-23 | House | Conference Committee Report 2049c: Adopted, Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2018-2049c; Regular Calendar 21Y-2N, Adopted; 05/23/2018; Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2018-2049c; 05/17/2018 |
2018-05-14 | House | ==CONTINUED== Conference Committee Meeting: 05/16/2018 02:30 PM Legislative Office Building 201 |
2018-05-11 | House | ==RECESSED== Conference Committee Meeting: 05/14/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 201 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Birdsell, Gannon, Watters; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Sen. Gannon Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-10 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. McConkey, Milz, J. Graham, Cloutier 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-10 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1807s;1824s;and 1932s and Requests CofC (Rep. McConkey): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2018-1807s, 2018-1824s, and 2018-1932s; OT3rdg; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Remainder of HB 2018 and the effective date, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Reconsideration on the remainder of HB 2018, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Remainder of HB 2018 and the effective date, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Sections 3 and 27; Regular Calendar 12Y-12N, Motion Failed; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | The Chair ruled the Question Divisible; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell Moved to divide the Question on HB 2018: Sections 3 and 27; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Without Objection, the Clerk is authorized to make technical and administrative corrections which are necessary to reflect the intent of the Senate, Motion Adopted; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Remainder of Floor Amendment # 2018-1932s; Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Floor Amendment # 2018-1932s: Section 9 (Lines 1-12); Regular Calendar 15Y-9N, Amendment Adopted, 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | The Chair ruled the Question Divisible; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Sen. Watters Moved to divide the Question on Floor Amendment 2018-1932: Section 9 (Lines 1-12) and then the balance of the amendment; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Sen. Giuda Offered Floor Amendment # 2018-1932s; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Sen. Carson Floor Amendment # 2018-1824s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Remainder of Committee Amendment 2018-1807s; Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment 2018-1807s: Section 3 (Lines 1-7), Regular Calendar 12Y-12N, Amendment Failed; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | The Chair ruled the Question Divisible; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Sen. Soucy Moved to divide the Question on Committee Amendment 2018-1807: Section 3 (Lines 1-7) and then the balance of the amendment; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Special Order to the end of the calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Special Order to after the bills removed from the consent calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1807s, 05/03/2018; |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Special Order to 05/03/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/02/2018 Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1807s, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Hearing: 04/10/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 16 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2018 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 10 |
2018-03-15 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0806h and 0888h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 43 |
2018-03-15 | House | FLAM # 2018-0888h (Rep. Cleaver): Amendment Adopted Regular Calendar 166-160 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 41 |
2018-03-15 | House | Amendment # 2018-0806h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 38 |
2018-03-07 | House | Special Order to 3/15/2018 Without Objection House Journal 7 P. 49 |
2018-03-07 | House | Suspend House Rule 65 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 125 |
2018-03-01 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0806h for 03/06/2018 (Vote 21-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 62 |
2018-03-01 | House | Executive Session: 02/21/2018 Legislative Office Building 201 |
2018-02-13 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/21/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2018-02-13 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Full Committee Work Session: 02/20/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2018-02-06 | House | ==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 02/14/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2018-02-06 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/13/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2018-02-06 | House | ==CONTINUED== Public Hearing: 02/13/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2018-01-24 | House | ==RECESSED== Public Hearing: 01/31/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 201 |
2018-01-19 | House | Introduced 01/09/2018 and referred to Public Works and Highways |
2018-01-19 | House | Late Drafting and Introduction Approved by Rules Committee 01/17/2018 |