NH HB201 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB201
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-26 - Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308
Pending: House Commerce and Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-26 - Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308
Pending: House Commerce and Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to review by the insurance department of coverage for pediatric autoimmune neuropsychiatric disorders.
Title
Relative to review by the insurance department of coverage for pediatric autoimmune neuropsychiatric disorders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-26 | House | Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308 |
2021-10-06 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/12/2021 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2021-08-17 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/21/2021 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2021-03-23 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Executive Session: 02/10/2021 01:40 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95521072179 |
2021-01-26 | House | Public Hearing: 02/02/2021 01:45 pm Members of the public may attend using the following links:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92235067141 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 2 P. 39 |
Same As/Similar To
HB201 (Carry Over) 2021-10-26 - Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308