NH HB200 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-26 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/26/2017 House Journal 4 P. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-26 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/26/2017 House Journal 4 P. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Food and Drug Administration approval of medication, equipment, and therapies.
Title
Relative to Food and Drug Administration approval of medication, equipment, and therapies.
Sponsors
Rep. J.R. Hoell [R] | Rep. Glen Aldrich [R] | Rep. Daniel Itse [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-26 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/26/2017 House Journal 4 P. 4 |
2017-01-19 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/26/2017 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 8 P. 3 |
2017-01-18 | House | Executive Session: 01/17/2017 Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-01-05 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2017 02:15 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2016-12-28 | House | Introduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 2 P. 20 |