NH HB2 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-30 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-30 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to state fees, funds, revenues, and expenditures.
Title
Relative to state fees, funds, revenues, and expenditures.
Sponsors
Rep. Neal Kurk [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-06 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 169 N: 177 NV: 18 Abs: 30) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | House | Died on Table |
2017-04-06 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Hinch): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/05/2017 House Journal 13 P. 62 |
2017-04-06 | House | Amendment #2017-1163h: Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 169-177 04/05/2017 House Journal 13 P. 60 |
2017-04-06 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Hoell): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/06/2017 |
2017-03-30 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2017-03-30 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1163h for 04/05/2017 (Vote 16-9; Regular Calendar) |
2017-03-21 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/28/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2017-03-21 | House | Executive Session: 03/27/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2017-03-22 | House | ==CONTINUED== Division III Work Session: 03/23/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2017-03-22 | House | ==CONTINUED== Division II Work Session: 03/23/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 209 |
2017-03-16 | House | Division III Work Session: 03/22/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2017-03-16 | House | Division II Work Session: 03/22/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2017-03-16 | House | ==CANCELLED== Division I Work Session: 03/22/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2017-03-16 | House | Division III Work Session: 03/21/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2017-03-16 | House | Division II Work Session: 03/21/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2017-03-16 | House | Division I Work Session: 03/21/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2017-03-16 | House | Division III Work Session: 03/20/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2017-03-16 | House | Division II Work Session: 03/20/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2017-03-16 | House | ==CANCELLED== Division I Work Session: 03/20/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2017-03-09 | House | Public Hearing on non-germane Amendment #2017-0829h: 03/17/2017 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2017-03-09 | House | Public Hearing on non-germane Amendment #2017-0637h: 03/17/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2017-03-09 | House | Division II Work Session: 03/15/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2017-03-01 | House | Public Hearing: 03/13/2017 03:00 PM Representatives Hall |
2017-03-01 | House | Public Hearing: 03/06/2017 05:30 PM Silver Center for the Arts at Plymouth State University - Plymouth NH |
2017-03-01 | House | Public Hearing: 03/06/2017 04:30 PM Derry Town Hall - Derry NH |
2017-02-17 | House | Introduced 02/16/2017 and referred to Finance House Journal 8 P. 43 |