NH HB196 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 04/25/2017; Chapter 21; Eff. 4/25/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a committee to study requiring passengers on school buses to wear seat belts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a committee to study requiring passengers on school buses to wear seat belts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-26HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 04/25/2017; Chapter 21; Eff. 4/25/2017
2017-04-20HouseEnrolled 04/06/2017 House Journal 13 P. 63
2017-04-19SenateEnrolled (In recess 04/06/2017); Senate Journal 14
2017-04-06SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/06/2017; Senate Journal 13
2017-03-29SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/06/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17
2017-03-21SenateHearing: 03/28/2017, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 16
2017-02-22SenateIntroduced 02/16/2017 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 7
2017-02-15HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0149h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 20
2017-02-15HouseAmendment #2017-0149h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 20
2017-02-10HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0149h for 02/15/2017 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 15
2017-01-24HouseExecutive Session: 02/01/2017 04:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203
2017-01-05HousePublic Hearing: 01/25/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203
2016-12-28HouseIntroduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Transportation House Journal 2 P. 20

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback