NH HB196 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Signed by the Governor on 6/2/2015; Chapter 63; Effective Date 8/1/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Signed by the Governor on 6/2/2015; Chapter 63; Effective Date 8/1/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the removal of identifying features from vehicles formerly used as ambulances.
Title
Requiring the removal of identifying features from vehicles formerly used as ambulances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | House | Signed by the Governor on 6/2/2015; Chapter 63; Effective Date 8/1/2015 |
2015-05-19 | House | Enrolled (in recess of 5/6/2015); House Journal 41, PG. 1781 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 5/14/2015); Senate Journal 15 |
2015-05-06 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1214s (Rep Steven Smith): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 41, PG. 1747 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1214s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 11 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1214s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1214s, 4/9/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 16 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Hearing: 3/24/15, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 14 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 8 |
2015-03-04 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0282h: Motion Adopted DV 263-73; House Journal 22, PG. 610 |
2015-03-04 | House | Amendment #0282h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 22, PG. 610 |
2015-02-20 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2015-02-20 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0282h for Mar 4 (Vote 17-1; Regular Calendar); House Calendar18, PG. 363-364 |
2015-02-04 | House | Continued Executive Session: 2/10/2015 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-01-29 | House | Executive Session: 2/3/2015 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 203 ==RECESSED== |
2015-01-14 | House | Public Hearing: 1/20/2015 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Transportation; House Journal 12, PG. 211 |