NH HB195 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2021-1708s (Rep. Abbas): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 206-155 06/10/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Adding display of a firearm as an exception to reckless conduct.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adding display of a firearm as an exception to reckless conduct.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-10 - House - Concur (Y: 206 N: 155 NV: 8 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - OTP (Y: 198 N: 169 NV: 10 Abs: 21) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-10HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 2021-1708s (Rep. Abbas): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 206-155 06/10/2021
2021-05-27SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-1708s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/27/2021; Senate Journal 17
2021-05-27SenateCommittee Amendment # 2021-1708s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/27/2021; Senate Journal 17
2021-05-25SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1708s, 05/27/2021; Senate Calendar 25A
2021-05-06SenateRemote Hearing: 05/10/2021, 01:15 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 23
2021-04-13SenateIntroduced 04/08/2021 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 12
2021-04-07HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 198-169 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 141
2021-03-04HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2021-03-04HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 11-10; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 34
2021-01-28HousePublic Hearing: 02/10/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/99588247178 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-04HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 2 P. 38

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=361&sy=2021&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=HB195
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&id=355&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=355
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=85&sy=2021&lb=H&eb=HB0195&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=HB195&ddlsponsors=&lsr=361
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=391&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=HB0195&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=HB195&ddlsponsors=&lsr=361
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=393&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=HB0195&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=HB195&ddlsponsors=&lsr=361
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=183&sy=2021&lb=H&eb=HB0195&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=HB195&ddlsponsors=&lsr=361

Bill Comments 750

feedback