NH HB191 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 237-121 02/22/2023 House Journal 6 P. 65
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 237-121 02/22/2023 House Journal 6 P. 65
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to voluntarily surrendered firearms.
Title
Relative to voluntarily surrendered firearms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-22 - House - ITL (Y: 237 N: 121 NV: 15 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - ITL (Y: 237 N: 121 NV: 21 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - ITL (Y: 237 N: 121 NV: 21 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-22 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 237-121 02/22/2023 House Journal 6 P. 65 |
2023-02-15 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB191 02/10/2023 (Vote ; 16-4) House Calendar 12 P. 17 |
2023-02-01 | House | Executive Session: 02/10/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-02-01 | House | Public Hearing: 02/10/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-01-03 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety |