NH HB191 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB191
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 190-162 01/05/2022 House Journal 1
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 190-162 01/05/2022 House Journal 1
Summary
Relative to prior authorizations and patient transfers under managed care group health insurance policies.
Title
Relative to prior authorizations and patient transfers under managed care group health insurance policies.
Sponsors
Rep. William Marsh [D] | Rep. Jerry Knirk [D] | Rep. Gary Woods [D] | Rep. Joyce Weston [D] |
Rep. James Murphy [D] | Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] | Sen. Kevin Cavanaugh [D] | Sen. Jay Kahn [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 190-162 01/05/2022 House Journal 1 |
2021-11-03 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2021-11-03 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB191 11/01/2021 (Vote 10-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 48 P. 21 |
2021-10-26 | House | Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308 |
2021-10-06 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/12/2021 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2021-08-17 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/21/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2021-03-23 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Executive Session: 02/10/2021 01:20 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95521072179 |
2021-01-26 | House | Public Hearing: 02/02/2021 09:45 am Members of the public may attend using the following links:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92235067141 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 2 P. 38 |
Same As/Similar To
HB191 (Carry Over) 2021-10-26 - Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=280&sy=2022&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2022&txtbillnumber=HB191 |