NH HB191 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-18 - Died on the Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to projects which are privately financed in energy efficiency and clean energy districts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to projects which are privately financed in energy efficiency and clean energy districts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-11-18HouseDied on the Table
2015-03-04HouseLay on Table (Rep J. Belanger): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 22, PG. 599
2015-02-20HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 4 (Vote 10-5; Regular Calendar); House Calendar18, PG. 360
2015-02-05HouseExecutive Session: 2/12/2015 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 301
2015-01-26House==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 1/28/2015 1:45 PM Legislative Office Building 301
2015-01-21House==POSTPONED== Public Hearing: 1/27/2015 1:45 PM Legislative Office Building 301
2015-01-14HousePublic Hearing: 1/20/2015 11:20 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301
2015-01-08HouseIntroduced and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 12, PG. 211

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback