NH HB190 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB190
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-07 - Full Committee Work Session: 06/23/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307
Pending: House Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-07 - Full Committee Work Session: 06/23/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307
Pending: House Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the duration of unemployment benefits.
Title
Relative to the duration of unemployment benefits.
Sponsors
Rep. Leonard Turcotte [R] | Rep. Matthew Simon [R] | Rep. Erica Layon [R] | Rep. JD Bernardy [R] |
Rep. Gregory Hill [R] | Sen. Timothy Lang [R] | Sen. William Gannon [R] | Sen. Keith Murphy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-07 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 06/23/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2023-03-16 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-03-03 | House | Executive Session: 03/15/2023 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2023-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/26/2023 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2023-01-03 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services |
Same As/Similar To
HB190 (Carry Over) 2023-06-07 - Full Committee Work Session: 06/23/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307