NH HB188 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/21/2019; Chapter 96; Eff: 08/20/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amending the definition of headway speed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending the definition of headway speed.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-24HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 06/21/2019; Chapter 96; Eff: 08/20/2019
2019-04-25HouseEnrolled 04/11/2019 House Journal 13 P. 127
2019-04-25SenateEnrolled (In recess 04/25/2019); Senate Journal 15
2019-04-11SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/11/2019; Senate Journal 12
2019-04-01SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/11/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 17
2019-03-21Senate==RESCHEDULED== Hearing: 03/26/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 15
2019-03-13Senate==CANCELLED== Hearing: 03/19/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 14
2019-03-12SenateIntroduced 03/07/2019 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 8
2019-02-14HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 21
2019-01-31HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/14/2019 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 11
2019-01-23HouseExecutive Session: 01/29/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305
2019-01-08HousePublic Hearing: 01/15/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 305
2018-12-26HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 2 P. 40

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback