NH HB186 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/28/2017; Chapter 159; eff. 01/01/18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to limitation of actions in which the state is a plaintiff.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to limitation of actions in which the state is a plaintiff.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-29HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 06/28/2017; Chapter 159; eff. 01/01/18
2017-06-13HouseEnrolled 06/08/2017 House Journal 18 P. 9
2017-06-13SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/08/2017); Senate Journal 20
2017-06-01HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 1399s (Rep. Hagan): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 3
2017-04-20SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2017-1399s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/20/2017; Senate Journal 14
2017-04-20SenateCommittee Amendment #2017-1399s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/20/2017; Senate Journal 14
2017-04-13SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1399s, 04/20/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 19
2017-03-29SenateHearing: 04/04/2017, Room 100, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 17
2017-03-14SenateIntroduced 03/09/2017 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 9
2017-03-09HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0286h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 18
2017-03-09HouseAmendment #2017-0286h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 18
2017-02-28HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0286h (NT) for 03/08/2017 (Vote 10-7; Regular Calendar)
2017-02-15HouseExecutive Session: 02/21/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2017-02-08HousePublic Hearing on non-germane Amendment #2017-0286h: 02/14/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2017-01-11HousePublic Hearing: 01/19/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2016-12-28HouseIntroduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 2 P. 19

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback