NH HB186 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 13Y-11N; Senate Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the authority of the department of state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the authority of the department of state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-17 - Senate - Interim Study (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Lay On Table (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-17SenateRefer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 13Y-11N; Senate Journal 9
2014-04-17SenateWithout Objection Senate Rule 4-2 is Suspended to Allow HB 186 to be acted on after the deadline, Motion Adopted, 2/3 Necessary; Senate Journal 9
2014-04-10SenateCommittee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 4/17/13; Senate Calendar 14
2014-02-13SenateSen. Bradley Moved Recommit to Finance, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 4
2014-02-13SenateSen. D'Allesandro Moved Remove From Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 4
2014-01-30SenateSen. Odell Moved Laid On Table, Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 13Y-11N
2014-01-30SenateRefer to Interim Study, Not Voted On
2014-01-22SenateCommittee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 1/30/14; Senate Calendar 4
2013-05-23SenateRereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote;
2013-05-10SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 5/23/13; Senate Calendar 21
2013-04-10SenateHearing: 4/16/13, Room 103, State House, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 16
2013-02-14SenateIntroduced and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 6
2013-02-06HouseOught to Pass with Amendment #0055h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.300-301
2013-02-06HouseAmendment #0055h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.300-301
2013-01-31HouseProposed Committee Amendment #2013-0055h; House Calendar 11, PG.174
2013-01-31HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0055h for Feb 6 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 11, PG.150
2013-01-23HouseExecutive Session: 1/29/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306
2013-01-16HousePublic Hearing: 1/22/2013 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306
2013-01-03HouseIntroduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 12, PG.186

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback