NH HB185 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-11 - House Signed by Governor 05/09/2011; Effective 07/08/2011; Chapter 0045
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-11 - House Signed by Governor 05/09/2011; Effective 07/08/2011; Chapter 0045
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to determining bargaining units for purposes of public employee collective bargaining.
Title
Relative to determining bargaining units for purposes of public employee collective bargaining.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-13 - Senate - Committee Amendment 1360s (Y: 7 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-15 - House - FLAM #0325H (REP GOLEY) (Y: 118 N: 251 NV: 30 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-15 - House - FLAM #0325H (REP GOLEY) (Y: 314 N: 52 NV: 33 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - FLAM #0325H (REP GOLEY) (Y: 118 N: 251 NV: 30 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-15 - House - FLAM #0325H (REP GOLEY) (Y: 314 N: 52 NV: 33 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-11 | House Signed by Governor 05/09/2011; Effective 07/08/2011; Chapter 0045 | |
2011-04-27 | Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 15, Pg.293 | |
2011-04-27 | House Enrolled; House Journal 40, PG.1386 | |
2011-04-13 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 12, Pg.254 | |
2011-04-13 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 12, Pg.252 | |
2011-04-13 | Senate Committee Amendment 1360s, Regular Calendar 7Y-17N, Amendment Failed; Senate Journal 12, Pg.252 | |
2011-04-07 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-1360s, 4/13/11; Senate Calendar 19 | |
2011-03-24 | Senate Hearing: 3/29/11, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 17 | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs | |
2011-02-15 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 17, PG.370-375 | |
2011-02-15 | House Floor Amendment #0325h (Rep Goley) Failed, Regular Calendar 118-251; House Journal 17, PG.373-375 | |
2011-02-15 | House Reconsideration (Rep Daniels): Motion Adopted Division Vote 250-116; House Journal 17, PG.373 | |
2011-02-15 | House Floor Amendment #2011-0325h (Rep Goley) Adopted, Regular Calendar 314-52; House Journal 17, PG.370-372 | |
2011-02-10 | House Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 13, PG.235 | |
2011-02-10 | House Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Feb 15 (Vote 13-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 13, PG.235 | |
2011-02-02 | House Executive Session: 2/8/2011 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307 | |
2011-01-19 | House Public Hearing: 2/1/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 | |
2011-01-11 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services; House Journal 11, PG. 175 |