NH HB182 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB182
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on December 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 38
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 38
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the adoption of a default budget.
Title
Relative to the adoption of a default budget.
Sponsors
Rep. Keith Ammon [R] | Rep. James Belanger [R] | Rep. Chris True [R] | Rep. James Spillane [R] |
Rep. Linda Gould [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 38 |
2017-10-19 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 12-3; Consent Calendar) |
2017-10-04 | House | Executive Session: 10/17/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2017-08-08 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/13/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2017-02-22 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-02-15 | House | ==CONTINUED== Public Hearing: 02/21/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2017-02-09 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/21/2017 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2017-02-01 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/08/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2017-01-25 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/01/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-01-19 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 01/25/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-01-12 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 01/25/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2017-01-11 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 01/24/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2017-01-10 | House | ==RECESSED== Public Hearing: 01/11/2017 01:45 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2016-12-28 | House | Introduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 2 P. 19 |
Same As/Similar To
HB182 (Carry Over) 2017-10-19 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 12-3; Consent Calendar)