NH HB182 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-09 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.309
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-09 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.309
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the definition of a child in need of services.
Title
Relative to the definition of a child in need of services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-09 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.309 | |
2011-01-21 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 9 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 10, PG.146 | |
2011-01-13 | House Public Hearing: 1/20/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 ==Executive Session to Follow== | |
2011-01-11 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Children and Family Law; House Journal 11, PG. 175 |