NH HB1809 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/02/2018; Chapter 356; Eff. 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/02/2018; Chapter 356; Eff. 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to balance billing under the managed care law and relative to coverage for emergency services.
Title
Relative to balance billing under the managed care law and relative to coverage for emergency services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - OTPA (Y: 326 N: 5 NV: 26 Abs: 35) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - OTPA (Y: 326 N: 5 NV: 26 Abs: 35) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-10 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/02/2018; Chapter 356; Eff. 07/01/2018 |
2018-06-05 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-29 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2091e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2091e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-10 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1638s (Rep. Hunt): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-1638s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-1638s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1638s, 05/03/2018; |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Special Order to 05/03/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/02/2018 Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1638s, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Special Order to 05/02/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 04/26/2018 Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1638s, 04/26/2018; Senate Calendar 18 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Hearing: 04/17/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 17 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0135h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 326-5 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 72 |
2018-03-06 | House | Amendment # 2018-0135h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 71 |
2018-02-28 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0135h for 03/06/2018 (Vote 18-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 37 |
2018-02-26 | House | Executive Session: 02/20/2018 Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-01-24 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/30/2018 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2018 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-12-14 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 1 P. 24 |