NH HB180 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB180
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on December 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 32
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 32
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring postsecondary education institutions to compile and submit reports on remedial education courses.
Title
Requiring postsecondary education institutions to compile and submit reports on remedial education courses.
Sponsors
Rep. Gregory Hill [R] | Rep. Natalie Wells [R] | Sen. Howard Pearl [R] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] |
Sen. Harold French [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 32 |
2017-11-15 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) |
2017-10-10 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 11/08/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-10-02 | House | Executive Session: 11/08/2017 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-09-20 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 10/10/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-09-06 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/20/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2017-08-23 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/07/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-05-09 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 05/16/2017 12:30 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-02-08 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-01-25 | House | Executive Session: 02/08/2017 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-01-04 | House | Public Hearing: 01/11/2017 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2016-12-28 | House | Introduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Education House Journal 2 P. 19 |
Same As/Similar To
HB180 (Carry Over) 2017-11-15 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar)