NH HB1799 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-20 - Executive Session: 10/16/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building205
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-20 - Executive Session: 10/16/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building205
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to blood testing for individuals exposed to perfluorinated chemicals in private or public water supplies.
Title
Relative to blood testing for individuals exposed to perfluorinated chemicals in private or public water supplies.
Sponsors
Rep. Mindi Messmer [D] | Rep. Jerry Knirk [D] | Rep. Mary Freitas [D] | Rep. James McConnell [R] |
Rep. Valerie Fraser [R] | Sen. Daniel Innis [R] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-20 | House | Executive Session: 10/16/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building205 |
2018-02-08 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 7 |
2018-01-31 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 02/07/2018 (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 9 |
2018-01-26 | House | Executive Session: 01/25/2018 Legislative Office Building 205 |
2018-01-23 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 01/25/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/11/2018 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-12-12 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 1 P. 24 |