NH HB178 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/16/2017; Chapter 126; I. Sec. 2 eff. 11/1/2017 ; II. Rem. eff. 6/16/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a commission to study processes to resolve right-to-know complaints.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a commission to study processes to resolve right-to-know complaints.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-19HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 06/16/2017; Chapter 126; I. Sec. 2 eff. 11/1/2017 ; II. Rem. eff. 6/16/2017
2017-05-17HouseEnrolled 05/04/2017 House Journal 15 P. 48
2017-05-12SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/11/2017); Senate Journal 17
2017-05-03HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment #2017-1586e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/20/2017 House Journal 14 P. 25
2017-05-03SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment #2017-1586e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 04/27/2017); Senate Journal 16
2017-04-20SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/20/2017; Senate Journal 14
2017-04-13SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/20/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 19
2017-03-21SenateHearing: 03/28/2017, Room 100, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 16
2017-03-07Senate==CANCELLED== Hearing: 03/14/2017, Room 100, State House, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 14
2017-02-22SenateIntroduced 02/16/2017 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 7
2017-01-26HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0049h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/26/2017 House Journal 4 P. 4
2017-01-26HouseAmendment #2017-0049h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/26/2017 House Journal 4 P. 4
2017-01-18HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0049h for 01/26/2017 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 8 P. 4
2017-01-11HouseExecutive Session: 01/17/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208
2017-01-04HousePublic Hearing: 01/11/2017 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 208
2016-12-28HouseIntroduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 2 P. 19

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback