NH HB178 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Signed by Governor 06/04/2013; Effective 06/04/2013; Chapter 0036
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Signed by Governor 06/04/2013; Effective 06/04/2013; Chapter 0036
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to public employer collective bargaining agreements.
Title
Relative to public employer collective bargaining agreements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | House | Signed by Governor 06/04/2013; Effective 06/04/2013; Chapter 0036 |
2013-05-08 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 41, PG.1424 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/2/13; Senate Calendar 18 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Hearing: 4/24/13, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 17 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Public & Municipal Affairs |
2013-03-13 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0623h(NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.820-821 |
2013-03-13 | House | Amendment #0623h(NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.820-821 |
2013-03-06 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 22, PG.525 |
2013-03-06 | House | Proposed Majority Committee Amendment #2013-0623h (New Title); House Calendar 22, PG.538 |
2013-03-06 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0623h(NT) for Mar 13 (Vote 18-2; Part II, Regular Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.525 |
2013-02-26 | House | Executive Session: 3/5/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307 |
2013-02-26 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 2/28/2013 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2013-02-26 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/28/2013 8:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2013-02-19 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/26/2013 8:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 |
2013-02-12 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/19/2013 8:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 ==TIME CHANGE (Orig 9:00 Amendment)== |
2013-01-30 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/5/2013 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 104 |
2013-01-14 | House | Public Hearing: 1/29/2013 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services; House Journal 12, PG.185 |