NH HB1776 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-21 - Executive Session: 10/11/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building104
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring installation of electric vehicle charging stations for use by members of the general court and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring installation of electric vehicle charging stations for use by members of the general court and making an appropriation therefor.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-21HouseExecutive Session: 10/11/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building104
2018-09-21HouseInterim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 10/11/2018 09:30 am Legislative Office Building104
2018-02-08HouseRefer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 9
2018-01-26HouseCommittee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 02/07/2018 (Vote 10-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 12
2018-01-26HouseExecutive Session: 01/11/2018 Legislative Office Building 104
2018-01-03HousePublic Hearing: 01/11/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 104
2017-12-01HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Legislative Administration House Journal 1 P. 23

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback