NH HB1773 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on November 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 214-135 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to campaign contributions and expenditures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to campaign contributions and expenditures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-08 - House - ITL (Y: 214 N: 135 NV: 14 Abs: 28) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-08HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 214-135 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 28
2018-01-31HouseMinority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study
2018-01-31HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/07/2018 (Vote 16-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 21
2018-01-25HouseExecutive Session: 01/30/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 308
2018-01-03HousePublic Hearing: 01/16/2018 10:50 am Legislative Office Building 308
2017-11-30HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Election Law House Journal 1 P. 23

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback