NH HB176 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on December 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 201-93 02/09/2017 House Journal 6 P. 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 201-93 02/09/2017 House Journal 6 P. 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the sale of cigar-related products.
Title
Relative to the sale of cigar-related products.
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Beaudoin [R] | Rep. Brandon Phinney [L] | Rep. Frank Sapareto [R] | Rep. Frank Sapareto [R] |
Rep. James Spillane [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-09 - House - ITL (Y: 201 N: 93 NV: 31 Abs: 71) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-09 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 201-93 02/09/2017 House Journal 6 P. 11 |
2017-02-01 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/09/2017 (Vote 13-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 9 |
2017-01-19 | House | Executive Session: 01/25/2017 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-01-18 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/25/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2017 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2016-12-28 | House | Introduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 2 P. 19 |