NH HB1739 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/02/2018; Chapter 354; Eff. 01/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting female genital mutilation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting female genital mutilation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-10HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 07/02/2018; Chapter 354; Eff. 01/01/2019
2018-05-15HouseEnrolled 05/10/2018
2018-05-11SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18
2018-05-08SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1790e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/03/2018); Senate Journal 17
2018-05-08HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1790e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/03/2018
2018-04-19HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 1278s (Rep. Welch): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 1
2018-04-12SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2018-1278s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/12/2018; Senate Journal 12
2018-04-12SenateCommittee Amendment # 2018-1278s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/12/2018; Senate Journal 12
2018-04-04SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1278s, 04/12/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 16
2018-03-15SenateHearing: 03/20/2018, Room 100, State House, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 13
2018-02-21SenateIntroduced 02/15/2018 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 5
2018-02-08HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 3
2018-01-31HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/07/2018 (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 6
2018-01-31HouseExecutive Session: 01/30/2018 Legislative Office Building 204
2018-01-05HousePublic Hearing: 01/17/2018 01:20 PM Legislative Office Building 204
2017-11-17HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 1 P. 21

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback