NH HB1731 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2018; Chapter 46; Eff. 7/14/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2018; Chapter 46; Eff. 7/14/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to regulating bicycles.
Title
Relative to regulating bicycles.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark MacKenzie [D] | Rep. Patricia Higgins [D] | Rep. David Woolpert [D] | Rep. David Luneau [D] |
Rep. Bob Rimol [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2018; Chapter 46; Eff. 7/14/2018 |
2018-04-19 | House | Enrolled 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 2 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/12/2018); Senate Journal 13 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/05/2018; Senate Journal 11 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/05/2018; Senate Calendar 15 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | ==CANCELLED== Hearing: 03/13/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 02:45 pm; Senate Calendar 11 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Introduced 02/15/2018 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 5 |
2018-02-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0271h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 16 |
2018-02-08 | House | Amendment # 2018-0271h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 16 |
2018-01-31 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2017-0271h (NT) for 02/07/2018 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 17 |
2018-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 01/30/2018 Legislative Office Building 203 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/23/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2017-11-17 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Transportation House Journal 1 P. 21 |