NH HB173 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-27 - House Signed By Governor 06/27/2011; Effective 01/01/2012; Chapter 0208
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-27 - House Signed By Governor 06/27/2011; Effective 01/01/2012; Chapter 0208
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to service of process on commercial tenants.
Title
Relative to service of process on commercial tenants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-27 | House Signed By Governor 06/27/2011; Effective 01/01/2012; Chapter 0208 | |
2011-06-08 | House Enrolled; House Journal 51, PG.1728 | |
2011-06-08 | Senate Enrolled | |
2011-06-08 | House House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1979s (Rep Rowe): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 51, PG.1715 | |
2011-05-25 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 18, Pg.391 | |
2011-05-25 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1979s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 18, Pg.377 | |
2011-05-25 | Senate Committee Amendment 1979s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 18, Pg.377 | |
2011-05-17 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-1979s, 5/25/11; Senate Calendar 25 | |
2011-04-21 | Senate Hearing: 4/26/11, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 21 | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Commerce | |
2011-02-09 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.312 | |
2011-02-03 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Feb 9 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 12, PG.203 | |
2011-01-26 | House Executive Session: 2/1/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-01-19 | House Division I Work Session: 1/25/2011 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-01-19 | House Public Hearing: 1/25/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-01-11 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 11, PG. 175 |