NH HB172 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/09/2017; Chapter 30; Eff. 7/8/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/09/2017; Chapter 30; Eff. 7/8/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to tax anticipation notes in counties.
Title
Relative to tax anticipation notes in counties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/09/2017; Chapter 30; Eff. 7/8/2017 |
2017-05-03 | House | Enrolled 04/20/2017 House Journal 14 P. 26 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/27/2017); Senate Journal 16 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/20/2017; Senate Journal 14 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/20/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 19 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Hearing: 03/22/2017, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 15 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Introduced 02/16/2017 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 7 |
2017-02-09 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/09/2017 House Journal 6 P. 5 |
2017-02-01 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/09/2017 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 5 |
2017-01-19 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Executive Session: 01/25/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-01-12 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 01/25/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2017-01-11 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 01/24/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2017-01-10 | House | Public Hearing: 01/11/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2016-12-28 | House | Introduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 2 P. 19 |