NH HB1705 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-18 - Executive Session: 10/02/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building302
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-18 - Executive Session: 10/02/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building302
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to enforcement activity verifying compliance.
Title
Relative to enforcement activity verifying compliance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-18 | House | Executive Session: 10/02/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building302 |
2018-08-22 | House | Interim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 09/18/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building303 |
2018-03-06 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 17 |
2018-02-28 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/06/2018 (Vote 18-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 10 |
2018-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 01/31/2018 Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-01-24 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/30/2018 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/11/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-11-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 1 P. 20 |