NH HB1700 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 315-58 02/08/2024 House Journal 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting the intentional release of polluting emissions, including cloud seeding, weather modification, excessive electromagnetic radio frequency, and microwave radiation and making penalties for violation of such prohibition.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting the intentional release of polluting emissions, including cloud seeding, weather modification, excessive electromagnetic radio frequency, and microwave radiation and making penalties for violation of such prohibition.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-08HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 315-58 02/08/2024 House Journal 4
2024-01-31HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 01/30/2024 (Vote 16-3; Regular Calendar)
2024-01-22HouseExecutive Session: 01/30/2024 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304
2024-01-22HouseFull Committee Work Session: 01/30/2024 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304
2024-01-17HousePublic Hearing: 01/22/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304
2024-01-11HousePublic Hearing: 01/16/2024 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 House Calendar 1 P. 2
2023-12-19HouseIntroduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 1

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback