NH HB1700 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 198; Eff. 1/1/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 198; Eff. 1/1/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the procedure for placing a security freeze on a consumer credit report.
Title
Relative to the procedure for placing a security freeze on a consumer credit report.
Sponsors
Rep. Kermit Williams [D] | Rep. Mel Myler [D] | Rep. Karen Ebel [D] | Rep. David Luneau [D] |
Sen. Dan Feltes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 198; Eff. 1/1/2019 |
2018-05-09 | House | Enrolled 05/03/2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/03/2018); Senate Journal 17 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/26/2018; Senate Calendar 18 |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Hearing: 04/17/2018, Room 100, State House, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 16 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0441h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 16 |
2018-03-06 | House | Amendment # 2018-0441h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 16 |
2018-02-27 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0441h (NT) for 03/06/2018 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 9 |
2018-02-26 | House | Executive Session: 02/21/2018 Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-02-14 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/20/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2018-01-24 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/01/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-11-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 1 P. 20 |