NH HB1700 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-09-19 - House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/2/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
Pending: House Commerce and Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-09-19 - House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/2/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
Pending: House Commerce and Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing licensing requirements for money transmitters.
Title
Repealing licensing requirements for money transmitters.
Sponsors
Rep. Spec Bowers [R] | Rep. William Infantine [R] | Rep. George Lambert [R] | Rep. Andrew Manuse [R] |
Rep. Mark Warden [R] | Sen. Raymond White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-19 | House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/2/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2012-09-19 | House Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/26/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2012-09-07 | House Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/18/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 =Banking Div= | |
2012-06-07 | House Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs for Interim Study; House Calendar 45, PG.2432 | |
2012-03-08 | House Refer to Interim Study (Rep Hunt): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 23, PG.1401 | |
2012-03-08 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Failed Voice Vote; House Journal 23, PG.1401 | |
2012-02-23 | House Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass; House Calendar 18, PG.1083-1084 | |
2012-02-23 | House Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 7 (Vote 11-6; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 18, PG.1083-1084 | |
2012-02-16 | House Executive Session: 2/21/2012 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 ==If Necessary Continued 2/23/2012 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302== | |
2012-02-09 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 2/16/2012 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2012-02-08 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/16/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2012-01-11 | House Public Hearing: 2/14/2012 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 =Banking Div= =Work Session May Follow= | |
2012-01-04 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 7, PG.364 |