NH HB170 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring a civics examination as a high school requirement.
Title
Requiring a civics examination as a high school requirement.
Sponsors
Sen. Timothy Lang [R] | Sen. Howard Pearl [R] | Rep. Joe Alexander [R] | Sen. Harold French [R] |
Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 6 |
2019-02-06 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/14/2019 (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 3 |
2019-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 02/05/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 207 |
2018-12-27 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 16 |