NH HB170 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/18/2017; Chapter 234; Eff. 1/1/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to posting notice and minutes of public meetings on the public body's website.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to posting notice and minutes of public meetings on the public body's website.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-20HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 07/18/2017; Chapter 234; Eff. 1/1/2018
2017-07-05HouseEnrolled 06/22/2017 House Journal 19 P. 27
2017-07-03SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/22/2017); Senate Journal 20
2017-06-23HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment #2017-2379e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/22/2017 House Journal 19 P. 23
2017-06-23SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment #2017-2379e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/22/2017); Senate Journal 20
2017-06-08HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 2032s (Rep. Hagan): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/08/2017 House Journal 18 P. 5
2017-05-31SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2017-2032s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/31/2017; Senate Journal 18
2017-05-31SenateCommittee Amendment #2017-2032s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/31/2017; Senate Journal 18
2017-05-25SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2032s, 05/31/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 25
2017-03-29SenateHearing: 04/04/2017, Room 100, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 17
2017-03-14SenateIntroduced 03/09/2017 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 9
2017-03-09HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0380h: Motion Adopted DV 313-45 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 17
2017-03-09HouseAmendment #2017-0380h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 17
2017-02-22HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2017-02-22HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0380h for 03/08/2017 (Vote 13-1; Regular Calendar)
2017-02-01House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/08/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2017-01-11House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 01/17/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208
2017-01-04HousePublic Hearing: 01/11/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2016-12-28HouseIntroduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 2 P. 19

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback