NH HB1697 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-22 - Signed by Governor Hassan 06/21/2016; Chapter 290; Eff. 6/21/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-22 - Signed by Governor Hassan 06/21/2016; Chapter 290; Eff. 6/21/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the operation and insurance of transportation network companies.
Title
Relative to the operation and insurance of transportation network companies.
Sponsors
Rep. John Hunt [R] | Rep. Steven Smith [R] | Rep. James Belanger [R] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] |
Sen. Donna Soucy [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-12 - Senate - Sen. Boutin Floor Amendment 1955s (Y: 9 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-22 | House | Signed by Governor Hassan 06/21/2016; Chapter 290; Eff. 6/21/2016 |
2016-06-15 | House | Enrolled 06/01/2016 House Journal 42 P. 66 |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/01/2016); Senate Journal 20 |
2016-06-01 | House | Conference Committee Report 2071c: Adopted, Voice Vote 06/01/2016 House Journal 42 P. 53 |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 2071c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/01/2016 Senate Journal 19 |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Filed, #2016-2071c; 05/26/2016 |
2016-05-20 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 05/25/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2016-05-24 | House | Conferee Change: Rep. Sykes Replaces Rep. Packard 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 30 |
2016-05-19 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Stiles, Little, Soucy; 05/19/2016; Senate Journal 18 |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Sen. Forrester Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/19/2016; Senate Journal 18 |
2016-05-19 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Steven Smith, T. Walsh, Packard, Hunt 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 7 |
2016-05-19 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1510s and Requests CofC (Reps. Hunt, Steven Smith): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 7 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/12/2016; Senate Journal 17 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Sen. Boutin Floor Amendment #2016-1955s, New Title, Regular Calendar 9Y-15N, Amendment Failed; 05/12/2016; Senate Journal 17 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/12/2016; Senate Calendar 18 |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1510s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 04/28/2016; Senate Journal 15 |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1510s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/28/2016 Senate Journal 15 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1510s, 04/28/2016; Senate Calendar 16 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Hearing: 04/12/2016, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 14 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Introduced 03/17/2016 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 10 |
2016-03-10 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0876h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2016 House Journal 25 P. 105 |
2016-03-10 | House | Amendment #2016-0876h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2016 House Journal 25 P. 105 |
2016-03-03 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate House Calendar 14 P. 82 |
2016-03-03 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0876h for 03/09/2016 (Vote 15-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 82 |
2016-03-03 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/02/2016 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2016-03-03 | House | ==CONTINUED== Subcommittee Work Session: 03/02/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2016-03-03 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/15/2016 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2016-03-03 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 03/15/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2016-03-02 | House | ==RECESSED== Subcommittee Work Session: 03/01/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2016-03-02 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 03/01/2016 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2016-02-10 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/18/2016 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 303 |
2016-02-10 | House | Public Hearing: 02/17/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2016-02-04 | House | Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs 02/04/2016 House Journal 11 P. 23 |
2016-02-04 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0176h and 0405h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/04/2016 House Journal 11 P. 23 |
2016-02-04 | House | FLAM #2016-0405h (Rep. Sanborn): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/04/2016 House Journal 11 P. 23 |
2016-02-04 | House | Amendment #2016-0176h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/04/2016 House Journal 11 P. 21 |
2016-01-28 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate House Calendar 5 P. 7 |
2016-02-04 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0176h for 02/04/2016 (Vote 14-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 7 |
2016-01-20 | House | Executive Session: 01/26/2016 02:30 PM Legislative Office Building203 |
2016-01-07 | House | Public Hearing: 01/12/2016 03:00 PM Legislative Office Building203 |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Transportation House Journal 4 P. 23 |