NH HB1680 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Signed by Governor Hassan 06/06/2016; Chapter 211; Eff. 6/6/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Signed by Governor Hassan 06/06/2016; Chapter 211; Eff. 6/6/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Extending the suspension of prior authorization requirements for a community mental health program on drugs used to treat mental illness.
Title
Extending the suspension of prior authorization requirements for a community mental health program on drugs used to treat mental illness.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-13 | House | Signed by Governor Hassan 06/06/2016; Chapter 211; Eff. 6/6/2016 |
2016-05-27 | House | Enrolled 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 29 |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/19/2016); Senate Journal 19 |
2016-05-19 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1664s and 1813s (Rep. Kotowski): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 20 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1813s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/12/2016; Senate Journal 17 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1813s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2016 Senate Journal 17 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1813s, New Title, 05/12/2016; Senate Calendar 18 |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1664s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 04/28/2016; Senate Journal 15 |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Sen. Kelly Floor Amendment #2016-1664s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/28/2016; Senate Journal 15 |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Sen. Kelly Moved Ought to Pass; 04/28/2016 Senate Journal 15 |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; 04/28/2016; Senate Journal 15 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 04/28/2016; Senate Calendar 16 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Hearing: 04/12/2016, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 14 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Introduced 03/17/2016 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 10 |
2016-03-09 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0622h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 41 |
2016-03-09 | House | Amendment #2016-0622h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 41 |
2016-03-03 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0622h for 03/09/2016 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 24 |
2016-03-03 | House | Executive Session: 03/02/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2016-02-09 | House | Public Hearing: 02/17/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 4 P. 23 |