NH HB1679 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 13 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2018 House Journal 4 P. 41
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the real estate transfer tax to be paid on certain acquisitions of business entities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the real estate transfer tax to be paid on certain acquisitions of business entities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-15HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2018 House Journal 4 P. 41
2018-02-09HouseSpecial Order to 2/15/2018 Without Objection House Journal 3 P. 81
2018-01-31HouseMinority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study
2018-01-31HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/07/2018 (Vote 13-10; Regular Calendar)
2018-01-26HouseExecutive Session: 01/24/2018 Legislative Office Building 202
2018-01-17HouseFull Committee Work Session: 01/24/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2018-01-03HousePublic Hearing: 01/16/2018 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 202
2017-11-13HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 1 P. 19

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback