NH HB1673 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/21/2018; Chapter 282; I. Sec. 8 eff. 1/1/2019; II. Rem. eff. 4/1/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the interest charged on late and delinquent property tax payments and relative to prorated assessments for damaged buildings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the interest charged on late and delinquent property tax payments and relative to prorated assessments for damaged buildings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-22 - House - ITL (Y: 126 N: 163 NV: 66 Abs: 36) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-26HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 06/21/2018; Chapter 282; I. Sec. 8 eff. 1/1/2019; II. Rem. eff. 4/1/2019
2018-05-29SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18
2018-05-29HouseEnrolled 05/23/2018
2018-05-10HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 1805s and 1841s (Rep. Major): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018
2018-05-03SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2018-1841s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16
2018-05-03SenateCommittee Amendment # 2018-1841s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16
2018-05-03SenateWithout Objection, Rule 3-17 is Suspended to Allow Non-Germane Amendment # 2018-1841s; 2/3 Necessary, Motion Adopted; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16
2018-05-03SenateChair Ruled Sections of Amendment # 2018-1841s Non-Germane, 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16
2018-05-02SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1841s, 05/03/2018;
2018-05-02SenateSpecial Order to 05/03/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/02/2018 Senate Journal 15
2018-04-30SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1841s, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19A
2018-04-26SenateHearing: 04/30/2018, Room 103, State House, 02:30 pm, on proposed amendment # 2018-1517s; Senate Calendar 19
2018-04-26SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2018-1805s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14
2018-04-26SenateSen. Daniels Floor Amendment # 2018-1805s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14
2018-04-26SenateCommittee Amendment # 2018-1626s, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14
2018-04-26SenateSpecial Order to the present time, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14
2018-04-18SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1626s, 04/26/2018; Senate Calendar 18
2018-03-15SenateHearing: 03/21/2018, Room 100, State House, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 13
2018-03-12SenateIntroduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 7
2018-02-22HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 56
2018-02-22HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 126-163 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 54
2018-02-22HouseRemoved from Consent (Rep. Burt) 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 3
2018-02-06HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/22/2018 (Vote 23-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 13
2018-01-26HouseExecutive Session: 01/24/2018 Legislative Office Building 202
2018-01-17HouseFull Committee Work Session: 01/24/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2018-01-03HousePublic Hearing: 01/16/2018 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 202
2017-11-13HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 1 P. 19

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback