NH HB1673 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - House Signed By Governor 05/29/2012; Effective 05/29/2012; Chapter 0095
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - House Signed By Governor 05/29/2012; Effective 05/29/2012; Chapter 0095
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to complaints of election law violations.
Title
Relative to complaints of election law violations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-31 | House Signed By Governor 05/29/2012; Effective 05/29/2012; Chapter 0095 | |
2012-05-17 | House Enrolled; House Journal 46, PG.2480 | |
2012-05-16 | Senate Enrolled | |
2012-05-09 | House House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1717s (Rep Bates): Motion Adopted Division Vote 308-12 | |
2012-04-25 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1717s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 11, Pg.416 | |
2012-04-25 | Senate Committee Amendment 1717s; Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 11, Pg.399 | |
2012-04-18 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2012-1717s, 4/25/12; Senate Calendar 16 | |
2012-03-22 | Senate Hearing: 3/27/12, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:50 a.m.; Senate Calendar 12 | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 7, Pg.187 | |
2012-03-07 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0956h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.1301 | |
2012-03-07 | House Amendment #0956h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.1301-1302 | |
2012-02-21 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2012-0956h; House Calendar 17, PG.1028-1029 | |
2012-02-21 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0956h for Mar 7 (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 18, PG.1064 | |
2012-02-15 | House Executive Session: 2/21/2012 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 308 | |
2012-02-08 | House Public Hearing: 2/14/2012 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 | |
2012-01-04 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Election Law; House Journal 7, PG.363 |