NH HB1672 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-19 - Pending Motion Ought to Pass; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting release of certain information relative to users of therapeutic cannabis to federal agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting release of certain information relative to users of therapeutic cannabis to federal agencies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - House - OTP (Y: 313 N: 18 NV: 15 Abs: 46) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-19SenatePending Motion Ought to Pass; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13
2018-04-19SenateSen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13
2018-04-10SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/19/2018; Senate Calendar 17
2018-03-22SenateHearing: 03/27/2018, Room 100, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 14
2018-03-21SenateIntroduced 03/21/2018 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 10
2018-03-15HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 313-18 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 11
2018-03-07HouseSpecial Order to 3/15/2018 Without Objection House Journal 7 P. 49
2018-03-07HouseSuspend House Rule 65 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 125
2018-02-28HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/06/2018 (Vote 13-5; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 59
2018-02-28HouseExecutive Session: 02/21/2018 Legislative Office Building 208
2018-01-11HousePublic Hearing: 01/25/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2017-11-13HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 1 P. 19

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback