NH HB1668 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on November 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 292-39 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 69
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 292-39 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 69
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to children's meals served by food service establishments.
Title
Relative to children's meals served by food service establishments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - House - ITL (Y: 292 N: 39 NV: 25 Abs: 35) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 292-39 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 69 |
2018-02-26 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 14-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 37 |
2018-02-26 | House | Executive Session: 02/21/2018 Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-02-14 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/20/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2018-01-11 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 02/14/2018 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-01-11 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 02/07/2018 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-11-13 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 1 P. 19 |