NH HB1664 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on December 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring certain non-public schools or education service providers that accept public funds to perform background checks on all employees and volunteers.
Title
Requiring certain non-public schools or education service providers that accept public funds to perform background checks on all employees and volunteers.
Sponsors
Rep. Marjorie Porter [D] | Rep. Sue Mullen [D] | Rep. Arthur Ellison [D] | Rep. Mary Heath [D] |
Rep. Linda Tanner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-03-07 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-02-03 | House | Public Hearing: 02/03/2022 9:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building205-207 |
2022-01-19 | House | Public Hearing: 02/03/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2021-12-30 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Education |