NH HB1664 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/25/2018; Chapter 86; Eff. 7/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to terms of appointment of members of governing boards for allied health professionals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to terms of appointment of members of governing boards for allied health professionals.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 05/25/2018; Chapter 86; Eff. 7/24/2018
2018-05-01SenateEnrolled (In recess 04/26/2018); Senate Journal 15
2018-05-01HouseEnrolled 04/26/2018
2018-04-12SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/12/2018; Senate Journal 12
2018-04-04SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/12/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 16
2018-03-22SenateHearing: 03/28/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 14
2018-03-14SenateIntroduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 7
2018-02-22HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 11
2018-02-13HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/22/2018 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 9
2018-02-13HouseExecutive Session: 02/01/2018 Legislative Office Building 306
2018-01-11HousePublic Hearing: 02/01/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306
2017-11-13HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 P. 19

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback