NH HB1663 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Signed by Governor Sununu 04/20/2018; Chapter 13; Eff. 4/20/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Signed by Governor Sununu 04/20/2018; Chapter 13; Eff. 4/20/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study reimbursement rates under automobile insurance policies.
Title
Establishing a committee to study reimbursement rates under automobile insurance policies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 04/20/2018; Chapter 13; Eff. 4/20/2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/12/2018); Senate Journal 13 |
2018-04-12 | House | Enrolled 04/12/2018 House Journal 12 P. 28 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/05/2018; Senate Journal 11 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/05/2018; Senate Calendar 15 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Hearing: 03/27/2018, Room 100, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 14 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0724h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 14 |
2018-03-06 | House | Amendment # 2018-0724h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 14 |
2018-02-27 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0724h (NT) for 03/06/2018 (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 9 |
2018-02-26 | House | Executive Session: 02/21/2018 Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-02-14 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/20/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2018-01-31 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/01/2018 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-11-13 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 1 P. 19 |