NH HB1659 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on December 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-09-10 - Interim Study Report: Recommended for Future Legislation (Vote 10-8)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to patient directed care and patient's rights with regard to end-of-life decisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to patient directed care and patient's rights with regard to end-of-life decisions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-10HouseInterim Study Report: Recommended for Future Legislation (Vote 10-8)
2020-08-19HouseFull Committee Work Session: 09/01/2020 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using this link: : https://www.zoom.us/j/94261411599 - Executive Session to Follow
2020-03-12HouseRefer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 148
2020-03-12HouseLay on Table (Rep. Baldasaro): Motion Failed DV 131-154 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 148
2020-03-05HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2020-03-05HouseMajority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/11/2020 (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 64
2020-02-05HouseExecutive Session: 03/04/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2020-01-15House==ROOM CHANGE== Public Hearing: 02/12/2020 01:00 pm Reps Hall
2019-12-16HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 1 P. 30

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback